editor@bureaucratsindia.in
Home
Interviews
Appointments and Transfers
BI Exclusive
Public Affairs
BI Exclusive
Good Governance
Central Government
CPSE
Appointments & Transfers
Corporate Governance
Tech Governance
Home
BI Exclusive
Good Governance
Central Government
CPSE
Appointments & Transfers
Corporate Governance
Tech Governance
Interviews
CSR
Webinar Discussion
Public Affairs
Home
Appointments & Transfers
Appointments & Transfers
Seven IPS officers reshuffled in Rajasthan
IG, Jail, Alok Kumar Vashistha, has been transferred as IG, Railways and Manish Agrawal-II, Deputy D...
November 15, 2021
by
Admin
15 IAS officers transferred in Rajasthan
According to the official order, Samit Sharma, Secretary, Social Justice and Empowerment Department,...
November 15, 2021
by
Admin
7 IAS, 17 HCS officers shifted in Haryana
PC Meena, Secretary, Grievances Department, Managing Director, Dakshin Haryana Bijli Vitran Nigam Lt...
November 15, 2021
by
Admin
1986 batch IPS officer Sheel Vardhan Singh appointed DG CISF, Atul Karwal DG NDRF
The force has since grown into a premier multi-skilled organization with a present strength of 1,63,...
November 10, 2021
by
Admin
10 IAS officers reshuffled in Tamil Nadu; S Krishnan appointed Secretary, Industries
P Amudha, earlier serving as an Additional Secretary in the Prime Minister’s Office, has been ...
November 08, 2021
by
Admin
10 IAS officers reshuffled in Gujarat; JP Gupta appointed Principal Secretary, Finance
Milind Torwane, Secretary, Finance Department (Economic Affairs), has replaced Gupta in Ahmedabad. A...
October 30, 2021
by
Admin
One IFS, 2 JKAS officers transferred
The Government of Union Territory of Jammu and Kashmir has ordered the transfer of two IFS and two J...
October 18, 2021
by
Admin
18 IAS, 36 IPS officers reshuffled in Rajasthan
Secretary, Labour, Employment, Skill and Entrepreneurship, Niraj K Pawan has been made Secretary, Co...
October 14, 2021
by
Admin
Punjab Police undergoes a major shake-up as 36 IPS, PPS officers are reshuffled
Shashi Prabha Dwivedi has been posted as ADG, HRD, while she will continue to hold the additional ch...
October 14, 2021
by
Admin
Veteran IAS officer Amit Khare appointed Advisor to Prime Minister Modi
A BSc (Physics) Graduate from St Stephen’s College, Khare holds an MBA degree from the Indian ...
October 13, 2021
by
Admin
Meera Mohanty appointed Joint Secretary in PMO
Mohanty, a 2005-batch IAS officer of the Himachal Pradesh cadre, is currently serving as the Directo...
October 12, 2021
by
Admin
5 IPS officers promoted in Uttarakhand
Five IPS officers in Uttarakhand have been promoted to the rank of Deputy Inspector General of Polic...
October 11, 2021
by
Admin
One IAS, 2 IPS officers transferred to Puducherry
Senior IPS officer Sanjay Beniwal, a 1989-batch officer and 2007-batch Mahesh Chand Bhardwaj, also a...
October 05, 2021
by
Admin
Five IAS transferred in Chhattisgarh
Ritesh Agrawal, an IAS officer of 2012 batch, who was Bijapur Collector, has been appointed new Coll...
October 02, 2021
by
Admin
Rajiv Bansal is new Civil Aviation Secretary; Govind Mohan goes to Culture Ministry as Secretary
Devendra Kumar Singh has been posted as Secretary, Ministry of Cooperation...
September 24, 2021
by
Admin
Ajay Yadav, IAS, appointed Private Secretary to Civil Aviation Minister Jyotiraditya Scindia
Atul Kumar Mishra, IPRS, 2010 has been selected for appointment as Deputy Secretary in the Ministry ...
September 24, 2021
by
Admin
Hussan Lal, 1995 batch IAS officer is new PS to Punjab Chief Minister
Senior IAS officer Hussan Lal, 1995 batch, has been appointed Principal Secretary to Punjab Chief Mi...
September 21, 2021
by
Admin
20 IAS, 2 IPS officers reshuffled in Chhattisgarh
Additional Chief Secretary (ACS) Subrat Kumar Sahoo, 1996 batch, has been relieved, and given ...
September 13, 2021
by
Admin
19 IAS officers including Karnal SDO whose controversial video went viral transferred in Haryana
Ayush Sinha, currently posted as SDO, Karnal has been posted as Additional Secretary, CRID...
September 02, 2021
by
Admin
Senior IAS officer Anurag Agarwal appointed ACS, Power, Punjab
He will also hold the charge of New & Renewable Energy Sources, Chairman-cum-Managing Director, ...
August 31, 2021
by
Admin
« Previous
Next »
Showing
321
to
340
of
378
results
‹
1
2
...
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
›
Latest News
LIC
LIC commits Rs 600 crore for digital transformation, aims to go paperless in two years
2
Adani
Adani Foundation inaugurates sanitary pad incinerator in Udupi
3
Pension
Finance Minister launches NPS Vatsalya, a pension scheme for children
Top News
LIC
LIC commits Rs 600 crore for digital transformation, aims to go paperless in two years
2
Adani
Adani Foundation inaugurates sanitary pad incinerator in Udupi
3
Pension
Finance Minister launches NPS Vatsalya, a pension scheme for children
© 2023, Copyrights Edtech. All Rights Reserved